Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/18/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 11/18/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 12/15/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 01/13/2010
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 01/13/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 01/13/2010
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 01/13/2010
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/10/2010