Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 11/16/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 01/13/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 02/22/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/22/2010
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 03/15/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/16/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/16/2010
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 03/16/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 05/13/2010
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 05/24/2010