Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 11/16/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/19/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 11/19/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 11/19/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 11/19/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 11/19/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 11/19/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 11/19/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 11/19/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 12/03/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 12/03/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 12/03/2009
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 12/03/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 12/03/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 12/03/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 12/16/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 12/16/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 01/20/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 01/20/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 01/20/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 01/20/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 01/20/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 01/20/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 01/27/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 01/27/2010
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/23/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 02/23/2010
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 02/23/2010
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 03/25/2010
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 04/29/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/06/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/14/2010
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/20/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 05/20/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/01/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 07/15/2010
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 07/15/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/29/2010