Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1]* 11/16/2009
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2]* 11/16/2009
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11]* 11/16/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 12/01/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 12/01/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 12/11/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 01/12/2010
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 04/29/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 05/20/2010
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 05/26/2010