Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 11/17/2009
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 11/17/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 11/17/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 11/17/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 11/17/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 11/17/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8]* 11/17/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 11/17/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 11/17/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 11/17/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 11/17/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 11/17/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7]* 11/17/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 11/17/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 11/19/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 12/02/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 12/02/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 12/02/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 12/10/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 12/10/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 12/10/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 12/10/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 12/15/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 12/15/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 12/15/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 12/15/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/03/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/03/2010
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 02/03/2010
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 02/03/2010
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 02/24/2010
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 04/26/2010
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 04/28/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/28/2010
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 05/20/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/25/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/25/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/15/2010
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 07/15/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 08/10/2010