Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 11/17/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 11/17/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 11/17/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 11/17/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 11/17/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 11/17/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 11/17/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 11/17/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 11/18/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 11/18/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 11/18/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 11/19/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 11/19/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 12/03/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 12/08/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 12/08/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 12/08/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 12/16/2009