Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 12/01/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 12/01/2009
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 12/02/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 12/02/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 12/02/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 12/02/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 12/02/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 12/02/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 12/02/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 12/02/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 12/02/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 12/02/2009
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 12/03/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 12/09/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 12/09/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 12/09/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 12/09/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 12/09/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 12/09/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 12/09/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 12/09/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 12/10/2009
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 12/10/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 12/10/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 12/10/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 12/10/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 12/10/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 12/10/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/04/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/28/2010