Text: H.R.4103 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/18/2009)


111th CONGRESS
1st Session
H. R. 4103


To extend the authority of the Secretary of Education to purchase guaranteed student loans for an additional year, and for other purposes.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

November 18, 2009

Mr. Kline of Minnesota (for himself, Mr. Guthrie, Mr. McKeon, Mr. Hoekstra, Mr. Souder, Mr. Wilson of South Carolina, Mrs. McMorris Rodgers, Mr. Cassidy, Mr. Roe of Tennessee, Mr. Thompson of Pennsylvania, and Mr. Ehlers) introduced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on Education and Labor


A BILL

To extend the authority of the Secretary of Education to purchase guaranteed student loans for an additional year, and for other purposes.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Extension of student loan purchase authority.

Section 459A of the Higher Education Act of 1965 (20 U.S.C. 1087i–1) is amended—

(1) by striking “July 1, 2010” each place it appears in subsections (a)(1), (a)(3), and (f) and inserting “July 1, 2011”; and

(2) in subsection (e)—

(A) by striking “September 30, 2010” each place it appears in paragraphs (1)(A) and (2) and inserting “September 30, 2011”;

(B) by striking “February 15, 2011” in paragraph (2) and inserting “February 15, 2012”; and

(C) by striking “2010, and 2011” in paragraph (3) and inserting “2010, 2011, and 2012”.

SEC. 2. Extension of authority to designate lenders for lender-of-last-resort program.

Section 428(j) of the Higher Education Act of 1965 (20 U.S.C. 1078(j)) is amended—

(1) in paragraph (6), by striking “June 30, 2010” and inserting “June 30, 2011”;

(2) in paragraph (7), by striking “June 30, 2010” and inserting “June 30, 2011”; and

(3) in paragraph (9)(A)—

(A) in the matter preceding subclause (I) of clause (ii), by striking “June 30, 2011” and inserting “June 30, 2012”;

(B) in subclause (III) of clause (ii), by striking “June 30, 2010” and inserting “June 30, 2011”; and

(C) in clause (iii), by striking “July 1, 2011” and inserting “July 1, 2012”.