Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 11/18/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 11/18/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 11/18/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 11/18/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 11/19/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 11/19/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 11/19/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 11/19/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 11/19/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 12/01/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 12/01/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 12/01/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 12/08/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 12/08/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 12/08/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 12/15/2009