Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 11/18/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/19/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 12/10/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 12/10/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 12/10/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 12/10/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 12/11/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 01/26/2010
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 02/04/2010
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/04/2010
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 04/26/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/26/2010