Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 11/19/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/01/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 12/01/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 12/01/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 12/01/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 12/01/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 12/01/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 12/02/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 12/03/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 12/08/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 12/09/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 12/11/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 01/13/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 01/27/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 02/23/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/12/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/29/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/18/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/24/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/24/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/15/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/23/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/16/2010