Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 11/19/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 12/03/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 12/03/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 12/03/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 12/16/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 12/16/2009
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 01/21/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 01/21/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 01/21/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 01/21/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/04/2010
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 02/22/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 02/26/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/04/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/04/2010
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 03/04/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/19/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/19/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/22/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/05/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/05/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/13/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 05/13/2010
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 05/24/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/28/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/24/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/24/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 11/16/2010