Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 12/02/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/02/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 12/02/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 12/02/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 12/02/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 12/02/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 12/02/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 12/02/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/02/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 12/02/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 12/02/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 12/08/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 12/08/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 12/08/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 12/08/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 12/08/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 12/08/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 12/08/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 12/08/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 12/08/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 12/09/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 12/09/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 12/09/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 12/09/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 12/16/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 12/16/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 12/16/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 12/16/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 12/16/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 01/15/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 01/15/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 01/15/2010
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 01/15/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 01/15/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 01/21/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 01/21/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 01/21/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 01/21/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 01/21/2010
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 01/21/2010
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 01/21/2010
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 01/21/2010
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 01/21/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 01/21/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 01/21/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 01/26/2010
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 01/26/2010
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 02/04/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 02/22/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 02/22/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/22/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/22/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 02/26/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/26/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 03/04/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 03/04/2010
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 03/09/2010
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 04/13/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/13/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/13/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 04/13/2010
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 04/13/2010
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 04/20/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/20/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/20/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 04/29/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/29/2010
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/29/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/04/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/05/2010
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 06/14/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/14/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 06/14/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/14/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/14/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/14/2010
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 06/14/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/15/2010
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/15/2010
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/15/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/17/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/21/2010
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 06/21/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/22/2010
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 06/24/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/24/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/24/2010
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 06/24/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/25/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/29/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/29/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 07/13/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/13/2010
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/19/2010
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 07/19/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 07/22/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/22/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/22/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/26/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/27/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/28/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 07/28/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 07/29/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/29/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/29/2010
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/29/2010
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 07/30/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/30/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 07/30/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/30/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 07/30/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/14/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 09/14/2010
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 09/14/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/14/2010
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 09/22/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/15/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 11/30/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 12/02/2010