There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Veterans Appeals Improvement and Modernization Act of 2009

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to improve the appeals process of the Department of Veterans Affairs, to establish a commission to study judicial review of the determination of veterans' benefits, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
11/19/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
11/20/2009Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
11/19/2009Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/19/2009Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (113)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 08/10/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 08/10/2010
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 08/10/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/14/2010
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 09/14/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 09/14/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/14/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 09/14/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/14/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 09/14/2010
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 09/14/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/14/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/14/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 09/14/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/14/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 09/14/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/14/2010
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 09/14/2010
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 09/14/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/14/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 09/14/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 09/14/2010
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 09/14/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 09/14/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/14/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/14/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/14/2010
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 09/14/2010
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/22/2010
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 09/22/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/23/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 09/23/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/23/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 09/23/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 09/23/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/23/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/23/2010
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 09/23/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/23/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 09/23/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/23/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/23/2010
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/23/2010
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 09/23/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/23/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/23/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 09/23/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/23/2010
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/23/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/28/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/28/2010
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 09/28/2010
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/28/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/28/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/28/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/28/2010
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 09/28/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 09/28/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 09/28/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/29/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/29/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 09/29/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/29/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/29/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/29/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/29/2010
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/29/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/29/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/29/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 09/29/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/29/2010
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 09/29/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/29/2010
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/29/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/29/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/29/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 09/29/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/29/2010
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 09/29/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 09/29/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 09/29/2010
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/29/2010
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 09/29/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/29/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/29/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/29/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 09/29/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/29/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/29/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/29/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 09/29/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/29/2010
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/29/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/29/2010
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/29/2010
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 09/29/2010
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 09/29/2010
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 09/29/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/29/2010
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 09/29/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 09/29/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 11/15/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 11/15/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 11/15/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 11/15/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 11/15/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs11/19/2009 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs11/20/2009 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4121.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4121. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/19/2009)

Veterans Appeals Improvement and Modernization Act of 2009 - Provides that if a veteran claimant submits evidence in support of a case for which a substantive appeal has been filed to the Board of Veterans' Appeals, such evidence shall be submitted directly to the Board and not to a regional office of the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA), unless the claimant requests that the evidence first be reviewed by the regional office.

Empowers the Court of Appeals for Veterans Claims to affirm, modify, reverse, remand, or vacate and remand a decision of the Board after deciding all relevant assignments of error raised on appeal. Provides that whenever the Court reverses a decision on the merits of a particular claim and orders an award of benefits, the Court need not decide any additional assignments of error relating to that claim.

Establishes the Veterans Judicial Review Commission to evaluate and make specific decisions to improve the administrative and judicial appellate review processes of veterans' and survivors' benefits determinations.