Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 11/19/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 11/19/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 11/19/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 12/03/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 12/03/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 12/03/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 12/16/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 12/16/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 12/16/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 12/16/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 01/05/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/02/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 02/02/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 02/04/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/14/2010
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 05/19/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/19/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/19/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/19/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/19/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/19/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/19/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/28/2010
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/17/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/27/2010