Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 11/19/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 11/19/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 12/01/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 12/01/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 12/01/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 12/01/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 12/02/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 12/03/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 12/03/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 12/03/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 12/08/2009
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 12/09/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 12/09/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 12/10/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 12/15/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 12/16/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 01/13/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 01/13/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 02/02/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 02/03/2010
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 02/03/2010
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 02/03/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 02/24/2010