Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 12/08/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/08/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/08/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 12/08/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 12/08/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 12/08/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 01/13/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 01/13/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 01/13/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 01/13/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 01/13/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 01/13/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 01/20/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 01/20/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 01/27/2010
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 01/27/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 01/27/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 01/27/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/22/2010
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 02/22/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/02/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/02/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/04/2010
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 03/15/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/15/2010
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 03/24/2010
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 03/25/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 04/15/2010
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 04/22/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/22/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/22/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/27/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/27/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/27/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 04/27/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/29/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/03/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 05/03/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/03/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/03/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/04/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/04/2010
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/06/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 05/25/2010
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/25/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/26/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/26/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/26/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/10/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/10/2010
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/14/2010
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/22/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/28/2010