Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 01/19/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 01/20/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/03/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/03/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/10/2010
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 07/22/2010
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/29/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/23/2010