Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 12/02/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 12/02/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 12/02/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/03/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 12/03/2009
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 12/03/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 12/03/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 12/16/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/12/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 01/12/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 01/12/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/24/2010