There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Medicare SGR Improvement and Reform Act of 2009

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to provide for an update under the Medicare physician fee schedule, to be fully paid for through medical liability reform, a pathway for biosimilar biological products, and other means.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
11/19/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
12/01/2009Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
11/19/2009Referred to House Judiciary
Action By: House of Representatives
11/19/2009Referred to House Ways and Means
Action By: House of Representatives
11/19/2009Referred to House Energy and Commerce
Action By: House of Representatives
11/19/2009Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/19/2009Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (46)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 12/01/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 12/01/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 12/07/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 12/09/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 12/09/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 12/09/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 12/09/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 12/09/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 12/09/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 12/09/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 12/09/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 12/09/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 12/09/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 12/09/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 12/09/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 12/09/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 12/09/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 12/09/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 12/09/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 12/09/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 12/09/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 12/10/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 12/10/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 12/15/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 12/16/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 12/16/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 01/19/2010
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 01/21/2010

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce11/19/2009 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health12/01/2009 Referred to
House Ways and Means11/19/2009 Referred to
House Judiciary11/19/2009 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4138.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4138. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/19/2009)

Medicare SGR Improvement and Reform Act of 2009 - Amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to provide an increased annual update for the Sustainable Growth Mechanism (SGR) formula for determining rates in the fee schedule for Medicare physician payments.

Sets a three-year time limit for the commencement of a health care lawsuit.

Prescribes requirements for: (1) unlimited damages for a claimant's actual economic losses in health care lawsuits; (2) court supervision of arrangements for payment of such damages, including limitation of contingent attorney fees; (3) restrictions on punitive damages; and (4) payment of future damages to claimants in health care suits.

Terminates funding of the Medicare Improvement Fund as of January 1, 2010.

Amends the Public Health Service Act to prescribe requirements for the licensure of biological products as biosimilar or interchangeable.

Includes under the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act fees relating to the licensure of a biological product.

Amends patent law with respect to biosimilar products.

Directs the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS) to adopt a single set of consensus-based operating rules for each health information transaction.