Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 12/01/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 12/01/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 12/01/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/01/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/01/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 12/01/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 12/02/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 12/07/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 12/10/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 12/10/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 12/10/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 12/10/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 12/10/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 12/14/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 12/14/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 12/14/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 12/15/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 01/13/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 01/20/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/02/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/04/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 02/04/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 02/22/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/03/2010