Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 12/02/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 12/02/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 12/02/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 12/02/2009
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 12/02/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 12/02/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 12/02/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 12/02/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 12/03/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 04/22/2010
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 05/06/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/15/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/29/2010