Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 12/02/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 12/02/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 12/02/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 12/16/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 12/16/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 12/16/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 12/16/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 01/20/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 01/20/2010
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 02/23/2010
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/15/2010