Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 12/02/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 12/02/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 12/03/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 12/10/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 01/12/2010
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 01/20/2010