Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 12/09/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 12/09/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 01/20/2010
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 01/26/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 04/28/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/13/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/09/2010

Show cosponsors who withdrew