Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/13/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/13/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/13/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/13/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/13/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/13/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/13/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 04/21/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/21/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/21/2010
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 04/21/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/21/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/21/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/21/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/22/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/22/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/04/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 05/04/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/04/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 05/12/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/12/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/12/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/25/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/26/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 06/09/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/09/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 06/10/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 06/10/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/10/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/14/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/22/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/22/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 06/23/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 06/23/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/24/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/30/2010
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/30/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/30/2010
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 07/14/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/15/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/15/2010
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 07/15/2010
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/21/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/21/2010
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 07/27/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/30/2010