Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 12/08/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 12/08/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 12/08/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 12/08/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 12/08/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 12/08/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 12/08/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 12/08/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 12/08/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/08/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 12/08/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 12/08/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 12/09/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 12/09/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 12/09/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 12/09/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 12/11/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 12/11/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 12/14/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 12/14/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 12/14/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 12/14/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 12/15/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 12/15/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 12/15/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 12/16/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 12/16/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 12/16/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 12/16/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 12/16/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 01/12/2010
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 01/12/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 01/12/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 01/12/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 01/12/2010
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 01/12/2010
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 01/20/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 01/20/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 01/20/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 01/20/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 01/20/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/02/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 02/02/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/02/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 02/02/2010
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 02/02/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 02/03/2010
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/04/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 02/04/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/04/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/05/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/22/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/22/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/25/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/25/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/02/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/09/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/12/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/12/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 03/17/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 03/19/2010
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 03/19/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/14/2010