Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 12/03/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 12/03/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 12/11/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 12/11/2009
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 12/11/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 12/15/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 12/15/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 12/16/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 12/16/2009
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 12/16/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/13/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 01/13/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 01/13/2010
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 01/20/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 01/20/2010
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 01/20/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 01/26/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/03/2010
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 02/03/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 02/03/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/23/2010
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 02/26/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/14/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/12/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/12/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/20/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/20/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/29/2010
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 09/14/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/22/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 11/18/2010