There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Green Infrastructure for Clean Water Act of 2009

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish centers of excellence for green infrastructure, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
12/03/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
12/24/2009Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Science and Technology
12/04/2009Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
12/03/2009Referred to House Science and Technology
Action By: House of Representatives
12/03/2009Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
Action By: House of Representatives
12/03/2009Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Science and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/03/2009Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (44)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 12/14/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 12/14/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/16/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 12/16/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/26/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 01/26/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 01/26/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 01/26/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/26/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/26/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 01/26/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 01/26/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/02/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/02/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/22/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 02/22/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/22/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 03/02/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/02/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/02/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/04/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/12/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/12/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/12/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/04/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/04/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/04/2010
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/04/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/04/2010
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 05/04/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/04/2010
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/04/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/04/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/19/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 05/19/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 07/01/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 07/01/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/01/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 07/30/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/30/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/30/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 09/23/2010

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure12/03/2009 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment12/04/2009 Referred to
House Science and Technology12/03/2009 Referred to
House Science and Technology Subcommittee on Energy and Environment12/24/2009 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4202. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (12/03/2009)

Green Infrastructure for Clean Water Act of 2009 - Requires the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) to make competitive grants to eligible higher education institutions and research institutions to establish and maintain between three and five centers of excellence for green infrastructure. Defines "green infrastructure" as a stormwater management technique that preserves, restores, enhances, or mimics natural hydrology.

Establishes the duties of each center, including: (1) researching green infrastructure; (2) developing manuals and setting industry standards on best management practices relating to state, local, and commercial green infrastructure; (3) providing information about its research and manuals to the national electronic clearinghouse center; (4) providing technical assistance and training on green infrastructure; and (5) evaluating regulatory and policy issues about green infrastructure.

Requires one of the centers to be designated as the national electronic clearinghouse center, which shall, in addition to its other duties, operate a website and a public database on green infrastructure.

Requires the Administrator to make competitive grants to eligible entities that manage stormwater, water resources, or waste water resources to: (1) plan and design and install green infrastructure projects; (2) develop standards and revisions to local zoning, building, or other local codes necessary to accommodate such projects; (3) develop fee structures to provide financial support for green infrastructure; (4) develop training and educational materials about green infrastructure; (5) develop and implement a green infrastructure portfolio standard program; (6) monitor and evaluate the environmental, economic, or social benefits of green infrastructure; and (7) implement a best practices standard for a green infrastructure program. Requires the Administrator to give priority to applications from: (1) a community that has combined storm and sanitary sewers in its collection system or is low-income or disadvantaged; or (2) an eligible entity that will use 10% of the grant for a low-income or disadvantaged community.

Requires the Administrator to: (1) establish within EPA's Office of Water a green infrastructure program to coordinate and promote the use of green infrastructure and to integrate green infrastructure into the permitting programs; (2) direct each EPA regional office to develop a program to promote and integrate the use of green infrastructure within the region; (3) create a green infrastructure compliance assistance center; and (4) establish measurable goals, to be known as the green infrastructure portfolio standard, to increase the percentage of annual water managed by eligible entities that uses green infrastructure.