Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 12/14/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 12/14/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/16/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 12/16/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/26/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 01/26/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 01/26/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 01/26/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/26/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/26/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 01/26/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 01/26/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/02/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/02/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/22/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 02/22/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/22/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 03/02/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/02/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/02/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/04/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/12/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/12/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/12/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/04/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/04/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/04/2010
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/04/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/04/2010
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 05/04/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/04/2010
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/04/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/04/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/19/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 05/19/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 07/01/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 07/01/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/01/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 07/30/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/30/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/30/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 09/23/2010