Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 12/15/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 01/15/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/24/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/29/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/28/2010