Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Public Law (12/16/2009)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Fiscal Year 2010 Federal Aviation Administration Extension Act, Part II - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to extend through March 31, 2010: (1) excise taxes on aviation fuels and air transportation of persons and property; and (2) the expenditure authority for the Airport and Airway Trust Fund.

Authorizes appropriations for the six-month period from October 1, 2009, through March 31, 2010, for airport improvement program (AIP) projects, including project grant authority. Sets forth a formula for calculating the apportionment of AIP funding.

Extends through March 31, 2010, various airport development projects, including: (1) the pilot program for passenger facility fees at nonhub airports; (2) small airport grants for airports located in the Marshall Islands, Micronesia, and Palau; (3) the temporary increase to 95% in the government share of certain AIP project costs; and (4) the funding of Midway Island airport development.

Extends through March 31, 2010, state and local land use compatibility projects under the AIP program.

Extends through March 31, 2010, the authority of the Metropolitan Washington Airports Authority to apply for an airport development grant and impose a passenger facility fee.

Extends through March 31 2010, Department of Transportation (DOT) insurance coverage for domestic and foreign-flag air carriers. Allows further extension through June 30, 2010.

Extends through June 30, 2010, air carrier liability limits for injuries to passengers resulting from acts of terrorism.

Extends through March 31, 2010, certain competitive access assurance requirements for large or medium hub airport sponsors applying for AIP grants.

Extends for the six-month period beginning October 1, 2009, the authorization of appropriations for: (1) Federal Aviation Administration (FAA) operations; (2) air navigation facilities and equipment; and (3) research, engineering, and development.