Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 12/08/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 12/08/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 12/08/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 12/08/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 12/08/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13]* 12/08/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 12/08/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 12/08/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 12/08/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 12/11/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 12/15/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 12/16/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 12/16/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 01/26/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 01/27/2010