Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 12/08/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 12/08/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 02/04/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/24/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/24/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 03/24/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/20/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 11/30/2010