Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 12/08/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 03/03/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/03/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/03/2010
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 03/03/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/12/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/12/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 03/12/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 04/15/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/15/2010
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/01/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 07/30/2010
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 09/29/2010