Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 01/12/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 01/13/2010
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 01/26/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/02/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 02/02/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/03/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/03/2010
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 02/03/2010
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 02/04/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/04/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 02/23/2010
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/23/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 02/23/2010
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 02/23/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 02/23/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 02/23/2010
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 02/23/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/25/2010
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/25/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 03/02/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/02/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/02/2010
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 03/02/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/04/2010
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 03/04/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 03/09/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 03/09/2010
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 03/10/2010
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 03/12/2010
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 03/12/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 03/15/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/15/2010
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/18/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/22/2010
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/22/2010
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 03/25/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/13/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 04/13/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 04/21/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/26/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/04/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 05/12/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/25/2010
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 06/15/2010
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/24/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 12/02/2010