Refine your search

Refined by:

Michigan Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 12/15/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 01/13/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 01/19/2010
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 01/19/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 01/21/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 04/27/2010