Refine your search

Refined by:

Ohio Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 12/11/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 12/15/2009
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 12/16/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 01/12/2010
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 01/13/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/14/2010
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 04/27/2010