Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 12/09/2009
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 12/10/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 12/10/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 12/11/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 12/14/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 12/19/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 01/12/2010
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 01/19/2010
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 01/21/2010