Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 01/27/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 01/27/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 01/27/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 01/27/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 02/03/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/03/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 02/03/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 02/09/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 03/03/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 03/10/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 03/10/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/23/2009
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 03/23/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 05/21/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 06/02/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/08/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/09/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/15/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/07/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 07/15/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/20/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/22/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/08/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 01/12/2010
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 03/15/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/20/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/20/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/21/2010