Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 12/10/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2]* 12/10/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 12/11/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 12/11/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 12/11/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 12/11/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 12/11/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 12/11/2009
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 12/11/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 12/11/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 12/11/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 12/11/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 12/11/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 12/11/2009
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 12/11/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 12/11/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 12/14/2009
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 12/14/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 12/14/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 12/14/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 12/15/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 12/15/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 12/15/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 12/16/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 12/16/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 12/16/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 12/16/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 01/13/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 01/13/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 01/19/2010
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 01/21/2010
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/02/2010
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/02/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 02/03/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 02/04/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 07/29/2010