Text: H.R.4263 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (12/10/2009)


111th CONGRESS
1st Session
H. R. 4263


To amend the American Recovery and Reinvestment Act of 2009 to extend for 1 year the period of temporary increase in the Medicaid FMAP.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

December 10, 2009

Ms. Baldwin (for herself, Mr. Gene Green of Texas, Ms. DeGette, Ms. Schakowsky, Mr. Blumenauer, Mr. Grijalva, Mr. McGovern, Ms. Pingree of Maine, and Mr. Pierluisi) introduced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce


A BILL

To amend the American Recovery and Reinvestment Act of 2009 to extend for 1 year the period of temporary increase in the Medicaid FMAP.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “State Medicaid Assistance Extension Act of 2009”.

SEC. 2. 1-year extension of ARRA increase in Medicaid FMAP.

Section 5001 of division B of the American Recovery and Reinvestment Act of 2009 (Public Law 111–5) is amended—

(1) in subsection (a)—

(A) by striking “and” at the end of paragraph (2);

(B) in paragraph (3), by striking “, but only for the first calendar quarter of fiscal year 2011” and inserting “; and”; and

(C) by adding at the end the following new paragraph:

“(4) fiscal year 2012 is less than the FMAP as so determined for fiscal year 2008, fiscal year 2009 (after the application of paragraph (1)), fiscal year 2010 (after the application of paragraph (2)), or fiscal year 2011 (after the application of paragraph (3)), the greatest of such FMAP for the State for fiscal year 2008, fiscal year 2009, fiscal year 2010, or fiscal year 2011 shall be substituted for the State's FMAP for fiscal year 2012, before the application of this section, but only for the first calendar quarter in fiscal year 2012.”;

(2) in subsection (c)(4)(C)(ii), by striking “December 2009” and “January 2010” and inserting “December 2010” and “January 2011”, respectively;

(3) in subsection (g)(1), by striking “September 30, 2011” and inserting “September 30, 2012”; and

(4) in subsection (h)(3), by striking “December 31, 2010” and inserting “December 31, 2011”.