Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 12/16/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 01/19/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/21/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/21/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/24/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/24/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/27/2010