There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Put America to Work Act of 2009

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of Labor to make grants to States, units of general local government, and Indian tribes for the purpose of creating employment opportunities for unemployed and underemployed residents in distressed communities.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
12/10/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
01/04/2010Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections.
Action By: Committee on Education and Labor
01/04/2010Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education, Lifelong Learning, and Competitiveness.
Action By: Committee on Education and Labor
12/10/2009Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/10/2009Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (69)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 12/11/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 12/11/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 12/11/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 12/11/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 12/11/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 12/11/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 12/11/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 12/11/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 12/11/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 12/11/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 12/15/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 12/16/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 01/13/2010
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 01/21/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 01/21/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 01/21/2010
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 01/27/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 01/27/2010
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 01/27/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/04/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/23/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/23/2010
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/23/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 02/23/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/23/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/23/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/23/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/25/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 02/25/2010
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 04/21/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and Labor12/10/2009 Referred to
House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Higher Education, Lifelong Learning, and Competitiveness01/04/2010 Referred to
House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Workforce Protections01/04/2010 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4268.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4268. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (12/10/2009)

Put America to Work Act of 2009 - Directs the Secretary of Labor to make grants to states, local government units, and Indian tribes to create employment opportunities for unemployed and underemployed residents of distressed communities.

Specifies grant uses, including funding of fast-track jobs for: (1) painting and repair of schools, community centers, and libraries; (2) restoration of abandoned and vacant properties; (3) expansion of emergency food programs to reduce hunger; (4) augmentation of staffing in Head Start and other early childhood education programs; and (5) renovation and maintenance of parks, playgrounds, and other public spaces.

Requires grant recipients to use remaining grant funds to make grants to public entities, nonprofit organizations, public-private partnerships, or small businesses to create employment opportunities in: (1) construction, rehabilitation, and improvements in energy efficiency of residences or public facilities; (2) the provision of human services; (3) remediation and demolition of vacant and abandoned properties; and (4) programs that provide opportunities for employment, education, and training for disadvantaged youth.