Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 12/11/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 12/11/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 12/11/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 12/11/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 12/11/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 12/11/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 12/11/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 12/11/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 12/11/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 12/11/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 12/15/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 12/16/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 01/13/2010
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 01/21/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 01/21/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 01/21/2010
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 01/27/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 01/27/2010
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 01/27/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/04/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/23/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/23/2010
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/23/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 02/23/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/23/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/23/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/23/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/25/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 02/25/2010
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 04/21/2010