Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 01/13/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/13/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 01/20/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 01/20/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 01/20/2010
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 01/26/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/02/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 02/02/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/02/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/02/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/02/2010
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 02/09/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/09/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/18/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/18/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/16/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/16/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 07/29/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/16/2010

Show cosponsors who withdrew