Summary: H.R.4284 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)All Information (Except Text)

Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 111-124 (12/28/2009)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Amends the Trade Act of 1974 to extend duty-free treatment under the Generalized System of Preferences from December 31, 2009, through December 31, 2010.

Amends the Andean Trade Preference Act (ATPA) to extend the ATPA program through December 31, 2010.

Extends through FY2010 preferential treatment for apparel articles assembled in one or more beneficiary countries from regional fabrics or regional components, and specified other type apparel (brassieres).

Advances from April 30, 2003, to June 30, 2010, the base scheduling date for biennial reports to Congress of the United States Trade Representative (USTR) on the operation of ATPA.

Amends the Consolidated Omnibus Budget Reconciliation Act of 1985 to extend customs fees for the processing of specified different kinds of merchandise entered into the United States: (1) from February 14, 2018, through May 14, 2018; and (2) from February 7, 2018, through June 7, 2018.

Amends the Tax Increase Prevention and Reconciliation Act of 2005 to increase by 1.5% (to 101.75% of such amount) the amount in effect on the date of enactment of this Act of any corporate estimated tax installment otherwise due by a corporation with assets of not less than $1 billion in July, August, or September 2014.