Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 12/16/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 01/12/2010
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 01/12/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 01/12/2010
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 01/13/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 01/19/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 01/20/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 01/26/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 02/02/2010