Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 12/16/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 12/16/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 12/16/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 12/16/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 01/13/2010
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 01/13/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 01/13/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 01/13/2010
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 01/13/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 01/13/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 01/13/2010
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 01/13/2010
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 01/13/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 01/20/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 01/27/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 01/27/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/02/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/02/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 02/02/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/02/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 02/03/2010
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 02/03/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 02/04/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/22/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 02/22/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/22/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 02/22/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 02/23/2010
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/24/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 02/25/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 03/04/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/09/2010
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 03/09/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/09/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/18/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/23/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/24/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 03/25/2010
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 03/25/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 04/14/2010
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/14/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/22/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/22/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/27/2010
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 04/29/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/11/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/25/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/26/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/27/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/08/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/14/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/17/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/17/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 06/23/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/23/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/28/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 07/01/2010
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/13/2010
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/15/2010
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 07/19/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/14/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 09/14/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 09/14/2010
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/22/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/22/2010