Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 02/24/2009
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 02/24/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/02/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 04/30/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/07/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/02/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/08/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 10/08/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 10/15/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 10/22/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/26/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/25/2010
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 02/25/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/18/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/18/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 06/16/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 07/26/2010